MD HB314 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court to issue an order authorizing or directing a law enforcement officer to use a cell site simulator after making a certain determination; requiring a law enforcement agency authorized to use a cell site simulator to take certain actions; limiting to 30 days or less the time period during which a cell site simulator may be used or location information may be obtained under the authority of a certain order; requiring cell site simulator use by law enforcement to begin 10 days after issuance of an order; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Cell Site Simulator Technology

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-3) (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-35) (Y: 103 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (41-3)
2018-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {928476/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (102-35)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {242719/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-01-30HouseHearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback