MD HB312 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting an employer from failing or refusing to make a reasonable accommodation for the known disability of an otherwise qualified applicant for employment; and expanding a certain undue hardship exception for employers regarding providing a certain reasonable accommodation to include certain qualified disabled applicants for employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discrimination in Employment - Reasonable Accommodations for Applicants With Disabilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-01-31HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-20HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB473 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government20603(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20606(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback