MD HB312 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 619
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the penalties for obstructing, hindering, or interfering with a school bus driver or a certain individual who is involved in providing public transportation services under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law – School Bus Driver and Public Transportation Worker – Obstructing, Hindering, or Interfering With

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-10) (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 619
2018-04-09HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (33-10)
2018-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-04-03SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {652218/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-01-30HouseHearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback