MD HB312 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that a person who applies for the renewal of a handgun permit is not required to be fingerprinted except under specified circumstances.
Title
Public Safety - Renewal of Handgun Permits - Fingerprinting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-1) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-1) (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618 |
2016-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2016-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-27 | House | First Reading Judiciary |