MD HB308 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Comptroller to maintain an online payment processing portal on its website to track payments made to payees; requiring the payment processing portal to have certain capabilities; requiring the unit of State government responsible for making a payment to a payee to update the online payment processing portal when the status of a payment changes; authorizing the Comptroller to consult with the Department of Information Technology in developing the online payment processing portal; etc.
Title
Comptroller - Online Payment Processing Portal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB281 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-08 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Communications
Comptroller
Cybersecurity
Data
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Public Information
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Comptroller
Cybersecurity
Data
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Public Information
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 4 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |