MD HB308 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Prince George's County Board of Education to include certain additional categories in the Prince George's County Board of Education annual budget; and requiring the Prince George's County Board of Education to provide information on whether the allocations for equity interventions in the annual budget are being increased, maintained, or reduced from the prior annual budget for each subcategory.
Title
Prince George's County - Board of Education Budget - Category PG 502-20
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Demographics
Discrimination
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Food
Job Training
Minorities
Poverty
Prince George's County
Revenue and Taxes
Budgets
Demographics
Discrimination
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Food
Job Training
Minorities
Poverty
Prince George's County
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0308?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0308f.pdf |