MD HB308 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 90-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a certain limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax for certain decedents; altering a certain limitation on the amount of the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after January 1, 2019; providing that, for the calculation of the Maryland estate tax in the case of a certain decedent spouse, the applicable exclusion amount includes the sum of a certain exclusion amount and a certain deceased spousal unused exclusion amount; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit

Sponsors

Del. James Tarlau [D]Del. Bilal Ali [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Angela Angel [D]
Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]
Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Pamela Beidle [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]
Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Michael Busch [D]Del. Ned Carey [D]
Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Frank Conaway [D]
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]
Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. William Frick [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]
Del. Angela Gibson [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]
Del. Antonio Hayes [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]
Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]
Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Sally Jameson [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]
Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Tony Knotts [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]
Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]
Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]
Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Cory McCray [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Aruna Miller [D]
Del. David Moon [D]Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]
Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Andrew Platt [D]
Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Shane Robinson [D]
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D]
Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]
Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Joseph Vallario [D]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]Del. Jay Walker [D]
Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]
Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Pat Young [D]

Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-48) (Y: 90 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
2018-03-27HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed (43-3)
2018-03-23SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-23SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-23SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-21SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (89-48)
2018-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-06HouseSpecial Order until 3/7 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
2018-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {915861/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-07HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback