MD HB308 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 90-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 90-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax for certain decedents; altering a certain limitation on the amount of the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying on or after January 1, 2019; providing that, for the calculation of the Maryland estate tax in the case of a certain decedent spouse, the applicable exclusion amount includes the sum of a certain exclusion amount and a certain deceased spousal unused exclusion amount; etc.
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-3) (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-48) (Y: 90 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-48) (Y: 90 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21 |
2018-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-3) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (89-48) |
2018-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-06 | House | Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {915861/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |