MD HB308 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board in the Department of Information Technology; providing for the membership, appointment, terms, staggering of terms, chair, meetings, and staffing of the Board; establishing that members of the Board may not receive a specified compensation but are entitled to a specified reimbursement; establishing specified duties and responsibilities of the Board; specifying the terms of the initial members of the Board; specifying the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established
Sponsors
Del. The Speaker [?] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2014-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2014-01-21 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
District of Columbia
Emergencies
Federal Government
Information Technology, Department of
Interstate Affairs
Municipal Corporations
Public Safety
Radio
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Communications
Counties
District of Columbia
Emergencies
Federal Government
Information Technology, Department of
Interstate Affairs
Municipal Corporations
Public Safety
Radio
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology