MD HB306 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State, through its appropriate officers and employees, to provide a reasonable break time for an employee to express breast milk for her nursing child after the child's birth each time the employee needs to express the milk and, on notice, to provide a certain place that may be used by an employee to express breast milk; and prohibiting the State from being required to compensate an employee receiving reasonable break time for any time spent expressing breast milk at work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing Mothers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 179
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {547772/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-23SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-20HouseFloor Amendment {373826/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted
2018-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {744766/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-02-06HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0306&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0306f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0306t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0306e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_179_hb0306e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0306_37382601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0306_74476601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0306_54777201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0306.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0306_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0130.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0306_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0961.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1096.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback