MD HB305 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-9)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to identify homeowners who may be eligible but have failed to apply for the homestead property tax credit; and requiring the Department to include a separate insert with each assessment notice sent to each homeowner that may be eligible for the property tax credit that informs the homeowner about the potential for eligibility and how to apply for the credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homestead Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-20SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-23SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {545468/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-06HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback