MD HB302 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the method by which an individual or a corporation may claim a credit against the State income tax for certain expenses related to certain wineries and vineyards in the State; extending for 3 years to June 30, 2021, a certain termination provision for an income tax credit for certain expenses made in connection with certain wineries and vineyards in the State; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax Credit – Wineries and Vineyards – Procedures to Claim Credit and Sunset Extension

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-1) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 613
2018-04-09HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2018-04-09HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2018-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {239634/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (133-1)
2018-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {835865/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-07HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0302&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0302f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0302t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0302e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_613_hb0302e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0302_83586501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0302_23963401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0302.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0302_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0529.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0302_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0930.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1451.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback