MD HB302 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a specified property tax credit for specified business entities that obtain specified new, improved, or expanded premises in specified commerce zones in Kent County; providing for the amount and duration of the property tax credit; authorizing the governing body of Kent County to provide, by law, for specified matters relating to the tax credit; and applying the Act retroactively to affect all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 125
2017-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-03-31SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-31SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2017-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-20SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2017-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {515766/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2017-02-16HouseHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-25HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0302&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0302f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0302t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_125_hb0302t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0302_51576601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0302.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0302_w&m.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0302_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0302,h-0779&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0302,s-1001&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback