MD HB301 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that, in a prosecution for certain sexual offenses, evidence that the defendant committed sexually assaultive behavior before or after the offense for which the defendant is on trial may be admissible for certain reasons; requiring that the State file a motion of intent to introduce evidence of sexually assaultive behavior at least 90 days before the trial or at a later time under certain circumstances; requiring the State to provide a copy of a certain motion to the defendant; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility (Repeat Sexual Predator Prevention Act of 2018)

Sponsors

Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Bilal Ali [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Angela Angel [D]
Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Mary Carozza [R]
Del. Jerry Clark [R]Del. John Cluster [R]Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Paul Corderman [R]
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. William Folden [R]
Del. Angela Gibson [D]Del. Glen Glass [R]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]
Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jalisi [D]
Del. Sally Jameson [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Trent Kittleman [R]Del. Tony Knotts [D]
Del. Benjamin Kramer [D]Del. Susan Krebs [R]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Susan McComas [R]
Del. Tony McConkey [R]Del. Cory McCray [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Mike Mckay [R]
Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. Warren Miller [R]Del. Marice Morales [D]Del. Dan Morhaim [D]
Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Charles Otto [R]Del. Neil Parrott [R]Del. Edith Patterson [D]
Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. April Rose [R]
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sid Saab [R]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]Del. Frank Turner [D]
Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Chris West [R]
Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]Del. Pat Young [D]Del. Christopher Adams [R]
Del. Kathy Afzali [R]Del. Carl Anderton [R]Del. Steven Arentz [R]Del. Susan Aumann [R]
Del. Wendell Beitzel [R]Del. Jason Buckel [R]Del. Andrew Cassilly [R]Del. Barrie Ciliberti [R]
Del. Mark Fisher [R]Del. Bob Flanagan [R]Del. Jeff Ghrist [R]Del. Robin Grammer [R]
Del. Kevin Hornberger [R]Del. Seth Howard [R]Del. Richard Impallaria [R]Del. Jay Jacobs [R]
Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]Del. Michael Malone [R]Del. Johnny Mautz [R]Del. Patrick McDonough [R]
Del. Herbert McMillan [R]Del. Ric Metzgar [R]Del. Christian Miele [R]Del. Matt Morgan [R]
Del. Teresa Reilly [R]Del. Deb Rey [R]Del. Haven Shoemaker [R]Del. Kathy Szeliga [R]
Del. David Vogt [R]Del. William Wivell [R]

Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {172019/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-01-30HouseHearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback