MD HB301 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person in Calvert County and Charles County to hunt deer on private property with a bow and arrow during open season on the last three Sundays in October and the second Sunday in November; authorizing a person in Calvert County, Charles County, and St. Mary's County to hunt deer on private property with a crossbow; and authorizing a person in Calvert County and St. Mary's County to hunt deer on private property on the first Sunday of bow hunting season in November and each Sunday during the deer firearms season.
Title
Calvert County, Charles County, and St. Mary's County - Deer Hunting on Private
Sponsors
Del. John Bohanan [D] | Del. Sue Kullen [D] | Del. Anthony O'Donnell [R] | Del. James Proctor [D] |
Del. Joseph Vallario [D] | Del. John Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-1) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-05 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-27 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (124-14) | |
2010-04-08 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (122-12) | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-27 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | First Reading Environmental Matters |