MD HB300 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Transportation, in cooperation with the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority, to study specified matters relating to the utilization of services provided by the Authority every 5 years; requiring that the study include an evaluation of specified ridership information; requiring the Department to submit a report detailing the results of the study to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015, and every 5 years thereafter; etc.
Title
Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-4) (Y: 129 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-4) (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-4) (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238 |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-4) |
2015-04-13 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {207970/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-4) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {360818/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-04 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Buses
Commuters
Counties
District of Columbia
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Pedestrians
Prince George's County
Railroads
Reports
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Buses
Commuters
Counties
District of Columbia
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Pedestrians
Prince George's County
Railroads
Reports
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of