MD HB3 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that the system of multiyear vehicle registration adopted by the Motor Vehicle Administration include for Class A (passenger) vehicles and Class D (motorcycle) vehicles options for registration for 1- or 2-year periods to be phased in over 5 years on a county-by-county basis; and requiring the Administration to make certain methods of obtaining or renewing a vehicle registration available for registration for 1- and 2-year periods.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Multiyear Registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2019-01-17HouseHearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2018-07-17HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback