MD HB298 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 614
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 614
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of the Environment to prepare a certain recommendation in connection with certain issues considered by the Public Service Commission; requiring the Secretary of Natural Resources to incorporate an evaluation of the impact of certain electric power plants on climate change into the Power Plant Research Program; requiring the Commission to consider the maintenance of fair and stable labor standards and the protection of the global climate in supervising and regulating certain public service companies; etc.
Title
Utility Regulation - Consideration of Climate and Labor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 614 |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-14) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-40) |
2021-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {423499/1 Adopted |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-12 | House | Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2020-08-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB83 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615
Subjects
Apprentices
Construction
Contractors
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Health Insurance
Industry and Technology
Pollution
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Service Commission
Reports
Residency
Salaries and Compensation
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Construction
Contractors
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Health Insurance
Industry and Technology
Pollution
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Service Commission
Reports
Residency
Salaries and Compensation
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 2 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 3 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 2 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |