MD HB298 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/4/2019) - Chapter 17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a network of oyster sanctuaries in the five tributaries identified by the Department of Natural Resources for large-scale restoration pursuant to the 2014 Chesapeake Bay Watershed Agreement; codifying the boundaries of certain oyster sanctuaries; prohibiting a person from catching oysters in or removing oysters from a certain oyster sanctuary, subject to a certain exception; requiring the Department to provide reports on certain restoration plans to certain committees of the General Assembly by certain dates; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Overridden (96-43) (Y: 96 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {733527/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30) (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-40) (Y: 99 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {753322/2 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (44-94) (Y: 45 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {733622/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (43-96) (Y: 44 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {773323/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (42-95) (Y: 43 N: 96 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {783122/1 (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (23-109) (Y: 24 N: 110 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {863128/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (44-92) (Y: 45 N: 93 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateGubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/4/2019) - Chapter 17
2019-04-08SenateVeto overridden (29-16)
2019-04-05HouseVeto overridden (96-43)
2019-04-04HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2019-03-27HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed (32-14)
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-25SenateFloor Amendment {733527/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30)
2019-03-22SenateLaid Over (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFloor Amendment {733527/1 (Senator Eckardt)
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-22SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFavorable
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (98-40)
2019-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13HouseFloor Amendment {863128/1 (Delegate Hornberger) Rejected (44-92)
2019-03-13HouseFloor Amendment {783122/1 (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (23-109)
2019-03-13HouseFloor Amendment {773323/1 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected (42-95)
2019-03-13HouseFloor Amendment {733622/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (43-96)
2019-03-13HouseFloor Amendment {753322/2 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (44-94)
2019-03-12HouseSpecial Order until 03/13 (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {410714/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0298&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0298f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0298t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_17_hb0298t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0298_41071401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0298_73362201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0298_75332202.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0298_77332301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0298_78312201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0298_86312801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0298_73352701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0298.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0298_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0414.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0415.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0416.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0417.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0418.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0441.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0298_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0760.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0796.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/veto_letters/hb0298.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1339.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback