MD HB298 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-09 - Special Order later today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance in the Maryland Higher Education Commission to require specified individuals to attend a specified financial counseling session under specified circumstances; specifying that the financial counseling session include specified matters; requiring the Office to adopt specified regulations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Student Financial Assistance - Service Obligation - Financial

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-09 Special Order later today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2010-04-09 Favorable with Amendments
2010-04-12 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-03-30 Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-03-26 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-03-24 Third Reading Passed (140-0)
2010-03-23 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-03-23 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2010-03-25 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2010-02-03 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-01-27 First Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback