MD HB293 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB863

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from sponsoring, conducting, or participating in organized contests that have the objective of killing a coyote, fox, or raccoon for prizes or monetary awards; establishing a $25 fine for each coyote, fox, or raccoon killed in violation of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-16HouseThird Reading Passed (105-24)
2021-02-11HouseSecond Reading Passed
2021-02-11HouseFavorable Adopted
2021-02-05HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/15 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2020-08-01HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB200 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-08 - Referred Environment and Transportation
HB863 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback