MD HB292 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified reporting requirement to require law enforcement agencies and the Department of State Police to report specified information regarding DNA collection and analysis to the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention instead of the Office of Legislative Audits; repealing the termination date for specified provisions of the statewide DNA data base law applicable to the collection, analysis, and reporting of specified information relating to DNA; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Statewide DNA Data Base System - DNA Sample Collection on Arrest - Reporting Requirement and Repeal of Sunset
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-7) (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 431 |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (39-7) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2013-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {562319/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2013-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Arrests
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Electronic Government
Genetics
Law Enforcement
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Safety
Reports
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Electronic Government
Genetics
Law Enforcement
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Safety
Reports
State Police, Department of
Sunset