MD HB290 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 719
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority, on or before December 31 each year, to submit a specified report to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on the procurement and implementation of the Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection System, including information related to efforts to review and analyze the location of specified toll plazas for specified purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection System

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 719
2017-04-08HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-06SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2017-03-30SenateHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (141-0)
2017-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {670815/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2017-02-16HouseHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-23HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0290&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0290f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0290t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_719_hb0290t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0290_67081501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0000/hb0290.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0290_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0290_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0290,h-0470&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0290,s-1251&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback