MD HB29 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-22 - Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-22 - Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain circumstances to allow a petition for an emergency evaluation to be made for certain individuals who have a substance use disorder; altering a certain exception to allow for the invountary admission of certain individuals who have a substance use disorder to certain facilities or a Veterans' Administration hospital; etc.
Title
Health - Standards for Involuntary Admissions and Petitions for Emergency Evaluation - Substance Use Disorder
Sponsors
Del. Julian Ivey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 3:45 p.m. |
2021-01-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-10-12 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Emergency Medical Services
Health
Hospitals
Mental and Behavioral Health
Petitions
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Substance Abuse
Veterans
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Emergency Medical Services
Health
Hospitals
Mental and Behavioral Health
Petitions
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Substance Abuse
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 10 | 616 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10 | 617 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10 | 622 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10 | 623 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10 | 632 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0029?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0029f.pdf |