MD HB287 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1272
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing in Harford County a resort complex license; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue one resort complex license to a person owning, leasing, or operating a resort complex; specifying that the license authorizes the holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor at certain outlets in the resort complex; establishing the days and times during which a license holder may serve alcoholic beverages; exempting the resort complex license from a certain license quota or restriction; etc.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2020-10-23 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1272 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Fees
Harford County
Hotels and Motels
Job Training
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Sports and Recreation
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Fees
Harford County
Hotels and Motels
Job Training
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
Sports and Recreation
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1005.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |