MD HB287 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing provisions of law in Allegany, Carroll, Charles, Harford, Kent, Montgomery, Queen Anne's, and Washington counties that prohibit a license holder or an employee from knowingly selling or providing an alcoholic beverage to an individual with an intellectual disability or to an individual if a family member or guardian has given written notice to the license holder or employee under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-1) (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (132-1)
2018-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {233199/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-23HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-22HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback