MD HB287 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law in Allegany, Carroll, Charles, Harford, Kent, Montgomery, Queen Anne's, and Washington counties that prohibit a license holder or an employee from knowingly selling or providing an alcoholic beverage to an individual with an intellectual disability or to an individual if a family member or guardian has given written notice to the license holder or employee under certain circumstances.
Title
Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-1) (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-1) (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306 |
2018-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-1) |
2018-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {233199/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Allegany County
Carroll County
Charles County
Developmental Disabilities
Harford County
Kent County
Montgomery County
Notices
Queen Anne's County
Retail Sales
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Allegany County
Carroll County
Charles County
Developmental Disabilities
Harford County
Kent County
Montgomery County
Notices
Queen Anne's County
Retail Sales
Washington County