MD HB287 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a specified definition for fiscal years 2017 through 2022 to determine the number of students used to calculate a specified grant for schools that participate in a specified federal program.
Title
Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-10) (Y: 127 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-10) (Y: 127 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 665 |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-10) |
2017-02-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {635469/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-23 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |