MD HB287 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to conduct a specified study of paratransit services provided for dialysis patients in the State; requiring the study to make specified determinations and evaluate scheduling of specified dialysis treatments; and requiring the Department to report the findings and any recommendations based on the study to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 15, 2013.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Study of Paratransit Services for Dialysis Patients
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn |
2013-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-24 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-01-29 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Diseases
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Mass Transit
Patients
Public Health
Reports
Transportation
Disabilities
Diseases
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Mass Transit
Patients
Public Health
Reports
Transportation