MD HB287 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, except on a valid prescription of a specified authorized prescriber, a person from marketing, selling, offering for sale, or distributing a specified aphrodisiac drug product; providing criminal penalties for a violation of the Act; and defining a certain term.
Title
Sexual Supplement Safety Act
Sponsors
Del. Saqib Ali [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] |
Del. Shawn Tarrant [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-28 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0287.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0287f.pdf |