MD HB284 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB53
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from driving a motor vehicle in a dedicated bus lane unless authorized by a local jurisdiction, subject to certain exceptions; authorizing Baltimore City to use, under certain standards and procedures, a certain bus lane monitoring system to enforce the prohibition against driving a motor vehicle in a designated bus lane; and providing for the payment of fines imposed and the distribution of revenues collected as a result of violations enforced by a bus lane monitoring system; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-28) |
2021-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {670919/1 Adopted |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-24 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-29 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB284 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Ambulances
Baltimore City
Bicycles
Buses
Certifications
Citations
Communications
Contractors
District Courts
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Surveillance
Emergency Services
Equipment
Evidence
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Fire Protection
Forms
Highways
Job Training
Judges
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Liability
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Recordings
Records
Rescue Squads
Revenue and Taxes
School Buses
Signatures
Signs and Billboards
Time
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Baltimore City
Bicycles
Buses
Certifications
Citations
Communications
Contractors
District Courts
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Surveillance
Emergency Services
Equipment
Evidence
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Fire Protection
Forms
Highways
Job Training
Judges
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Liability
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Photography
Recordings
Records
Rescue Squads
Revenue and Taxes
School Buses
Signatures
Signs and Billboards
Time
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 10 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 4 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 1133 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 1134 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |