MD HB284 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of General Services, the Secretary of Transportation, the Chancellor of the University System of Maryland, and the President of Morgan State University to adopt certain regulations by December 31, 2019, to require the qualification of a business as a small business under certain circumstances; requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt regulations providing for the certification of a business as a minority business enterprise under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procurement – Small Businesses and Minority Businesses – Qualification and Certification (Small and Minority Business Certification Streamlining Act of 2019)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 315
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {344631/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {296585/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-01-30HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0284&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0284f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0284t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0284e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_315_hb0284e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0284_29658501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0284_34463101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0284.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0284_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0424.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0284_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0954.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1220.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback