MD HB281 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring county boards to require public high schools to offer at least one high-quality computer science course beginning in the 2021-2022 school year; establishing the Maryland Center for Computing Education to identify ways to expand access to high-quality computer science education, strengthen the skills of educators, and increase the number of computer science teachers; requiring the Center to work with certain institutions of higher education; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Computer Science - Curriculum and Professional Development (Securing the Future: Computer Science Education for All)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 358
2018-04-09HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate Recede
2018-04-09SenateCommittee Amendment {884035/1 Withdrawn
2018-04-09SenateMotion Recede (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2018-04-05HouseDelegates Luedtke, M. Washington, and Afzali
2018-04-05HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-05HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2018-04-05HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {884035/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-21SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-02SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (135-1)
2018-02-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {285465/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-08HouseHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-19HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0281&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0281f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0281t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_358_hb0281t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0281_28546501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0281_88403501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0281.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0281_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0281_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0183.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1116.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1311.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback