MD HB278 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB979
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to include in a certain report certain statistics related to the cost of living of inmates at certain facilities; and requiring the Division of Correction to include in a certain report regarding Maryland Correctional Enterprises certain statistics regarding the race, age, and sex of certain inmates, disaggregated by job classification and wage scale.
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Cost-of-Living Report - Maryland Correctional Enterprises Diversity Report
Sponsors
Del. Debra Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 116 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (116-16) |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-17 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB979 (Carry Over) 2020-03-14 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Correction, Division of
Demographics
Prices
Prisoners
Public Safety
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Demographics
Prices
Prisoners
Public Safety
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 3 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 3 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |