MD HB277 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB782
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-11)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-11)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Purple Star Schools Program to recognize public schools that provide strong services and support for military-connected students and their families when, as a result of military service, a military-connected student transfers schools; establishing certain minimum criteria to qualify as a Purple Star School; and authorizing a public school to partner with the county board to fulfill the Department requirements to qualify as a Purple Star School under the Act.
Title
Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65 |
2022-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-0) |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {263523/1 Adopted |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-01-20 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-17 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB234 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
HB782 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
HB782 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Armed Forces
Counselors
Curriculum
Death
dependents
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
internet
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Students
Veterans
Volunteers
Counselors
Curriculum
Death
dependents
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
internet
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Students
Veterans
Volunteers