MD HB277 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Making it a civil rather than a criminal offense to consume an alcoholic beverage in public under certain circumstances or to possess an alcoholic beverage in an open container under certain circumstances; requiring certain offenders to be issued a citation under certain circumstances; providing a certain maximum fine; altering the penalty for certain conduct relating to betting, wagering, or gambling; making certain conduct relating to betting, wagering, or gambling a civil offense; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Alcohol Offenses and Gaming - Civil Offenses (Decriminalization of Petty Nonviolent Offenses Act)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-19HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
2018-01-25HouseHearing canceled (Economic Matters)
2018-02-23HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
2018-01-19HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback