MD HB277 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Making additional State units that are responsible for the management of specified funds subject to requirements under current law concerning the use of minority business enterprise brokerage and investment services firms, as specified; specifying that an annual report that must be submitted to the Governor and the General Assembly by all of the units that are subject to the minority business enterprise brokerage and investment services firm requirements include diversity information, as specified; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government - Brokerage and Investment Management Services - Use of

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-22 Approved by the Governor
2012-03-30 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2012-03-29 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-29 Favorable with Amendments 204036/1 Report Adopted
2012-04-04 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2012-03-01 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs & Budget and Taxation
2012-04-02 Passed Enrolled
2012-04-02 Third Reading Passed (128-3)
2012-04-02 House Concur - Senate Amendments
2012-02-29 Third Reading Passed (134-2)
2012-02-28 Special Order until 2/29 (Delegate Schulz) Adopted
2012-02-23 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-02-23 Favorable with Amendments 776989/1 Report Adopted
2012-02-22 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2012-02-01 Hearing 2/8 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-01-27 First Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback