MD HB275 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting, on or after December 31, 2020, the use of chlorpyrifos in the State, including insecticides containing chlorpyrifos and seeds treated with chlorpyrifos; authorizing the Department of Agriculture to grant a waiver, under certain circumstances, to allow a person to use chlorpyrifos on or before December 31, 2022; and requiring the Department, with existing budgeted resources, to provide to farmers, certified crop advisors, and pesticide applicators certain education and assistance relating to integrated pest management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-44) (Y: 91 N: 45 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {233529/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (43-92) (Y: 44 N: 93 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {203925/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (44-89) (Y: 45 N: 90 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (90-44)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {463622/1 (Delegate Carr) Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {233529/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (43-92)
2019-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {203925/1 (Delegate Ghrist) Rejected (44-89)
2019-03-12HouseSpecial Order until 03/13 (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {930814/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0275&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0275f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0275t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0275_93081401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0275_20392501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0275_23352901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0275_46362201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0275.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0275_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0458.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0459.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0523.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback