MD HB273 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a prohibition, in Anne Arundel County, on a person standing in a certain highway to solicit money or donations; authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County or of a municipal corporation in the county to enact a permit program to allow individuals of at least 18 years of age to stand in a roadway, a median divider, or an intersection to solicit money or donations from the occupant of a vehicle; requiring a plan for safely soliciting money in a roadway to include training in traffic safety; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-11) (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-11) |
2019-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Arikan) Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {920712/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Advertising
Age of Majority
Anne Arundel County
Counties - Local Laws
Education
Evidence
Fire Protection
Gifts
Highways
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Operation
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Pedestrians
Religion
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Solicitation
Sunset
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Veterans
Zoning and Planning
Age of Majority
Anne Arundel County
Counties - Local Laws
Education
Evidence
Fire Protection
Gifts
Highways
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Operation
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Pedestrians
Religion
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Solicitation
Sunset
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Veterans
Zoning and Planning