MD HB273 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a prohibition, in Anne Arundel County, on a person standing in a certain highway to solicit money or donations; authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County or of a municipal corporation in the county to enact a permit program to allow individuals of at least 18 years of age to stand in a roadway, a median divider, or an intersection to solicit money or donations from the occupant of a vehicle; requiring a plan for safely soliciting money in a roadway to include training in traffic safety; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-11) (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (127-11)
2019-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Arikan) Adopted
2019-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {920712/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-05HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback