MD HB272 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a definition of "sociological information" adopted in rules or regulations by an official custodian for certain purposes from including a certain notice, or a list of the recipients of a certain notice; requiring a custodian to deny inspection under the Public Information Act of only a certain part of a certain distribution list, rather than the full distribution list; requiring a custodian to allow the inspection of a certain notice or a list of recipients of a certain notice under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Sociological Information and Distribution Lists
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {996580/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 4:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-23 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2020-09-25 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Demographics
Disclosure
Examinations
Inspections
Notices
Public Information
Records
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Disclosure
Examinations
Inspections
Notices
Public Information
Records
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 4 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 4 | 330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 4 | 341 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 12 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |