MD HB272 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "practice podiatry" to include the surgical treatment of acute ankle fracture in the scope of practice of licensed podiatrists; and requiring qualifications that a hospital or related institution sets for granting specified privileges for specified services to include consideration of specified training, education, and experience.
Title
Health Occupations - Licensed Podiatrists - Scope of Practice and Hospital Privileges
Sponsors
Del. Kirill Reznik [D] | Del. Robert Costa [R] | Del. John Donoghue [D] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Del. Eric Bromwell [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {216782/2 Report Adopted |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |