MD HB271 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 146
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing the certificate of title fee to $50 for a trailer with gross vehicle weight of 3,000 pounds or less if the trailer is transferred to a spouse, child, grandchild, parent, sibling, grandparent, father-in-law, mother-in-law, son-in-law, daughter-in-law of the transferor, or a niece or nephew of the transferor if the transferor is at least 65 years of age at the time of the transfer; and prohibiting the involvement of money or other valuable considerations in the transfer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title Fee - Trailer Gifted to Family Member

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 146
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-09SenateHearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-28SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-27HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2020-02-25HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments {420514/1 Adopted
2020-02-24HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-21HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-20HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation13802(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback