MD HB268 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB64

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that the spouse of a person on trial for a crime may be compelled to testify as an adverse witness if the spouse and the person on trial married after the date on which the alleged crime for which the person is on trial occurred.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04SenateHearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
2021-02-24SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-02-23HouseThird Reading Passed (121-11)
2021-02-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-16HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-12-23HouseHearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2020-09-18HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB64 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings9106(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback