MD HB268 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland, subject to specified approvals, to authorize the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science to award specified joint graduate degrees and post baccalaureate certificates; and including the Center in the definition of "public senior higher education institution".
Title
University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science - Joint Graduate Degree Granting Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Environmental Matters
Higher Education
Licenses
State Universities and Colleges
Environmental Matters
Higher Education
Licenses
State Universities and Colleges