MD HB267 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination date of the Joint Committee on Unemployment Insurance Oversight; and requiring the Committee to complete a specified study of provisions of law relating to employing units engaged in seasonal industries and to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2010.
Title
Joint Committee on Unemployment Insurance Oversight - Termination Date and
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-04-01 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2010-04-01 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-05 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-25 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
General Assembly
Insurance
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
Sunset
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment
General Assembly
Insurance
Legislative Services, Department of
Reports
Sunset
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment