MD HB265 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual to resume participation in the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection in the Employees' Pension System or Teachers' Pension System if the individual has been separated from employment and has accrued a certain amount of eligibility service; providing for the retroactive application of the Act; requiring certain service credit earned in the Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit to be credited to the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection; etc.
Title
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Teachers
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Teachers
Time
Work, Labor and Employment