MD HB263 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a judicial officer to consider the recommendation of a certain pretrial release services program in making a certain determination; requiring a court or District Court commissioner to consider including certain no-contact provisions as a condition of pretrial release if a certain pretrial release services program has made a certain request; requiring a certain pretrial release services program to notify the court on receipt of certain information; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-07HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-01-25HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback