MD HB262 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the circumstances under which certain individuals are exempt from paying the out-of-state tuition rate at public institutions of higher education; altering the circumstances under which certain individuals are eligible to pay the resident tuition rate at a public senior higher education institution or the in-county rate at a community college; requiring certain individuals to retain a certain tuition status until the individual is awarded a certain degree under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (30-16) (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-37) (Y: 93 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (30-16)
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-29SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-26SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed (92-37)
2019-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-22HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback