MD HB260 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB161
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring oversight of the inspection of the offices of dispensing physicians from the Office of Controlled Substances Administration to the State Board of Physicians; altering the circumstances under which a physician may dispense drugs, devices, or topical medications; requiring that certain appropriations be transferred to the Board on the effective date of the Act; providing for the transfer of certain functions, powers, duties, property, records, fixtures, credits, assets, liability, obligations, rights, and privileges; etc.
Title
State Board of Physicians - Dispensing Permits
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {513020/1 Adopted |
2022-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-13 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
HB260 (Carry Over) 2022-03-04 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB305 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-25 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
SB305 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-25 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Drugs
Ethics
Federal Government
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Inspections
Licenses
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Nonprofit Organizations
Nurse Practitioners
Penalties and Sentences
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Records
Reports
Safety
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Drugs
Ethics
Federal Government
Fees
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Inspections
Licenses
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Nonprofit Organizations
Nurse Practitioners
Penalties and Sentences
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Records
Reports
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 12 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 12 | 102.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 12 | 102.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |